Home > OneUnited Bank > History

OneUnited Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for OneUnited Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1982-08-02Acquired (19831)
1982-08-02Institution established: Original name:The Boston Bank of Commerce
1999-09-10Acquired Peoples National Bank of Commerce, Miami (18147) in MIAMI, FL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2001-04-30Acquired Founders National Bank (33305) in LOS ANGELES, CA
2002-12-16Changed name to OneUnited Bank
2002-12-31Acquired Family Savings Bank, F.S.B. (30376) in LOS ANGELES, CA