Home > Jersey Shore State Bank > History
Jersey Shore State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Jersey Shore State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-05-12 | Institution established: Original name:Jersey Shore State Bank | |
1941-07-08 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1941-07-08 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1970-10-19 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1970-10-19 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1995-04-07 | Acquired Lock Haven Savings Bank (28771) in LOCK HAVEN, PA | |
1999-01-11 | Acquired The First National Bank of Spring Mills (7764) in SPRING MILLS, PA | |
2013-05-16 | Moved bank headquarters from JERSEY SHORE, PA to WILLIAMSPORT, PA |