Home > United Bank > History
United Bank, History
The following are major historical events for United Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1979-05-10 | Institution established: Original name:The George Mason Bank | |
1985-08-01 | Reorganized. | |
1992-09-18 | Acquired The Washington Bank (21181) in falls church, VA | |
1997-05-16 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1997-06-07 | Acquired George Mason Bank, National Association (24504) in BETHESDA, MD | |
1998-04-18 | Acquired United Bank (21317) in ARLINGTON COUNTY, VA | |
1998-04-18 | Changed name to United Bank | |
2003-10-11 | Acquired Sequoia Bank (27454) in BETHESDA, MD | |
2007-07-14 | Acquired The Marathon Bank (27411) in STEPHENS CITY, VA | |
2007-07-14 | Acquired Rockingham Heritage Bank (33195) in HARRISONBURG, VA | |
2014-02-01 | Acquired Virginia Commerce Bank (27249) in ARLINGTON, VA | |
2016-06-04 | Acquired Bank of Georgetown (57941) in WASHINGTON, DC | |
2017-04-22 | Acquired Cardinal Bank (34733) in MCLEAN, VA | |
2017-11-11 | Acquired United Bank (6784) in PARKERSBURG, WV | |
2020-05-01 | Acquired CresCom Bank (57135) in CHARLESTON, SC |