Zions Bancorporation, N.A., History

The following are a list of major historical events for Zions Bancorporation, N.A., including mergers and acquisitions.

1873-07-06Institution established: Original name:The Utah State National Bank of Salt Lake City
1949-02-01Changed name to Utah First National Bank of Salt Lake City
1952-07-01Changed name to First National Bank of Salt Lake City
1957-12-31Changed name to Zions First National Bank
1970-05-29Acquired Bank of Commerce (18771) in MAGNA, UT
1970-07-01Acquired Bank of St. George (11192) in ST. GEORGE, UT
1970-09-30Acquired Bountiful State Bank (9206) in BOUNTIFUL, UT
1973-05-31Acquired Bank of Vernal (1263) in VERNAL, UT
1973-08-01Acquired Carbon Emery Bank (1255) in PRICE, UT
1978-01-10Acquired First State Bank (1258) in SALINA, UT
1978-01-10Acquired Richfield Commercial and Savings Bank (12775) in RICHFIELD, UT
1978-12-01Acquired Zions First National Bank of Ogden (20873) in OGDEN, UT
1981-01-02Acquired The First National Bank of Logan (2261) in LOGAN, UT
1981-12-11Acquired Zions First National Bank of Orem (23238) in OREM, UT
1981-12-11Acquired Zions First National Bank of Cedar City (23109) in CEDAR CITY, UT
1986-01-24Acquired Pioneer State Bank (22818) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
1986-12-31Acquired The Lockhart Co. (26506) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
1988-02-12Acquired Basin State Bank (23395) in VERNAL, UT
1988-05-27Acquired Sandy State Bank (22511) in SANDY, UT
1990-05-25Acquired Deseret Savings and Loan Association, F.A. (32813) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
1992-02-28Acquired Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. (33094) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
1993-10-29Acquired Wasatch Bank (20631) in OREM, UT
1995-06-05Acquired First Western National Bank (18481) in MOAB, UT
1997-08-15Acquired Tri-State Bank (18873) in MONTPELIER, ID
2001-01-26Acquired Draper Bank and Trust (19169) in DRAPER, UT
2015-12-31Acquired Amegy Bank National Association (24107) in HOUSTON, TX
2015-12-31Acquired Nevada State Bank (18113) in LAS VEGAS, NV
2015-12-31Acquired Zions Trust, Natioanl Association (57638) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
2015-12-31Acquired California Bank & Trust (20852) in SAN DIEGO, CA
2015-12-31Acquired National Bank of Arizona (20626) in TUCSON, AZ
2015-12-31Acquired The Commerce Bank of Washington, National Association (27298) in SEATTLE, WA
2015-12-31Acquired Vectra Bank Colorado, National Association (2993) in FARMINGTON, NM
2016-01-01Changed name to ZB, National Association
2018-09-30Changed name to Zions Bancorporation, N.A.