Home > Wintrust Bank > History
Wintrust Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Wintrust Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1994-09-14 | Institution established: Original name:North Shore Community Bank & Trust Company | |
2013-10-19 | Acquired Diamond Bank, FSB (29539) in SCHAUMBURG, IL | |
2014-06-07 | Changed name to Wintrust Bank | |
2014-06-07 | Moved bank headquarters from WILMETTE, IL to CHICAGO, IL | |
2015-07-02 | Acquired North Bank (20152) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2018-08-01 | Acquired Delaware Place Bank (22370) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2019-05-24 | Acquired Oak Bank (20226) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2019-10-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2019-10-01 | Changed name to Wintrust Bank, National Association | |
2019-10-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |