WEX Bank, History
The following are major historical events for WEX Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1998-06-01 | Institution established: Original name:Wright Express Financial Services Corporation | |
2004-08-23 | Moved bank headquarters from MURRAY, UT to SALT LAKE CITY, UT | |
2010-03-29 | Moved bank headquarters from SALT LAKE CITY, UT to MIDVALE, UT | |
2012-10-25 | Changed name to WEX Bank | |
2021-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from 7090 SOUTH UNION PARK AVENUE, SUITE 350, MIDVALE, UT to 111 East Sego Lily Drive, Sandy, UT. |