Home > Western State Bank > History
Western State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Western State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-10-01 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Webster | |
1968-01-17 | Changed name to Western State Bank | |
1968-01-17 | Moved bank headquarters from WEBSTER, ND to DEVILS LAKE, ND | |
1997-06-09 | Acquired State Bank of Towner (22663) in TOWNER, ND | |
2013-05-14 | Acquired Central Arizona Bank (34527) in SCOTTSDALE, AZ as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2021-12-31 | Moved bank headquarters from 110 FOURTH STREET SE, DEVILS LAKE, ND to 110 4th St SE, DEVILS LAKE, ND. | |
2021-12-31 | Reorganized. |