Home > Western National Bank > History
Western National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Western National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1917-04-07 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Summerfield | |
2009-11-01 | Changed name to Western National Bank | |
2014-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from SUMMERFIELD, KS to CHESTER, NE | |
2014-01-01 | Acquired State Bank of Chester (16881) in CHESTER, NE | |
2017-07-01 | Acquired Byron State Bank (22350) in BYRON, NE | |
2021-07-01 | Acquired Mainstreet BankWestern National Bank (18528) in COOK, NE. |