Home > Waypoint Bank > History
Waypoint Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Waypoint Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1883-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank in Cozad | |
1916-12-28 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANDFATHERED | |
1972-07-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1972-07-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2002-09-30 | Acquired The First National Bank of Otis (3046) in OTIS, CO | |
2004-11-19 | Acquired Farmers State Bank (8597) in EUSTIS, NE | |
2007-08-27 | Acquired First State Bank (8603) in IMPERIAL, NE | |
2013-06-01 | Acquired The First National Bank of Cambridge (5389) in CAMBRIDGE, NE | |
2017-10-10 | Changed name to Waypoint Bank |