Home > Washington Trust Bank > History
Washington Trust Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Washington Trust Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-11-03 | Institution established: Original name:The Washington Trust Bank | |
1951-01-25 | Changed name to Washington Trust Bank | |
1980-12-06 | Acquired Eastern Washington Bank (20452) in MOSES LAKE, WA | |
1994-09-26 | Acquired The Columbia Bank (17183) in WENATCHEE, WA | |
1997-03-17 | Acquired Northern State Bank (22777) in COEUR D'ALENE, ID | |
2009-02-13 | Acquired Pinnacle Bank (57342) in BEAVERTON, OR as part of a government assisted transaction. |