Home > Vision Bank > History
Vision Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Vision Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1924-11-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank in Ada | |
1959-10-01 | Changed name to The First National Bank and Trust Company of Ada | |
2000-01-01 | Acquired The Prague National Bank (4184) in PRAGUE, OK | |
2005-04-04 | Changed name to Vision Bank, National Association | |
2012-11-30 | Acquired Community Bank of the Arbuckles (21564) in SULPHUR, OK |