Home > VIKING BANK > History
VIKING BANK, History
The following are major historical events for VIKING BANK, including mergers and acquisitions.
1981-04-07 | Institution established: Original name:Viking Savings Association, FA | |
1987-03-31 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
2009-01-01 | Changed name to Viking Savings Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2017-01-01 | Changed name to Viking Bank | |
2019-12-02 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2019-12-02 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2019-12-02 | Changed name to VIKING BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION | |
2019-12-02 | Acquired First State Bank of Ashby (8196) in ASHBY, MN |