Home > Vantage Bank Texas > History
Vantage Bank Texas, History
The following are major historical events for Vantage Bank Texas, including mergers and acquisitions.
1923-11-06 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Refugio | |
2007-07-06 | Changed name to San Antonio National Bank | |
2012-02-17 | Changed name to Vantage Bank Texas, National Association | |
2013-08-03 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2013-08-03 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2013-08-03 | Changed name to Vantage Bank Texas | |
2013-08-03 | Moved bank headquarters from REFUGIO, TX to SAN ANTONIO, TX | |
2014-10-01 | Acquired D'Hanis State Bank (11550) in D HANIS, TX | |
2018-11-20 | Acquired Inter National Bank (25879) in MCALLEN, TX |