Home > United Security Bank > History
United Security Bank, History
The following are major historical events for United Security Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1987-12-21 | Institution established: Original name:United Security Bank, National Association | |
1995-08-25 | Acquired Golden Oak Bank (22737) in OAKHURST, CA | |
1999-02-03 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1999-02-03 | Changed name to United Security Bank | |
2004-04-24 | Acquired Taft National Bank (24250) in TAFT, CA | |
2007-02-12 | Acquired Legacy Bank, N.A. (57536) in CAMPBELL, CA |