Home > United Prairie Bank > History
United Prairie Bank, History
The following are major historical events for United Prairie Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1919-07-21 | Institution established: Original name:Farmers State Bank of Mountain Lake | |
1985-08-02 | Acquired Farmers State Bank of Round Lake (10970) in ROUND LAKE, MN | |
1987-05-29 | Acquired The First National Bank of Wilmont (5275) in WILMONT, MN | |
1992-02-25 | Changed name to United Prairie Bank | |
2006-05-06 | Acquired United Prairie Bank - Owatonna (1926) in OWATONNA, MN | |
2006-05-06 | Acquired United Prairie Bank-Spicer (9347) in SPICER, MN | |
2006-06-10 | Acquired United Prairie Bank - Madison (10580) in MADISON, MN | |
2006-06-10 | Acquired United Prairie Bank-Jackson (9350) in JACKSON, MN | |
2006-06-10 | Acquired United Prairie Bank-Slayton (22121) in SLAYTON, MN | |
2006-06-10 | Acquired United Prairie Bank-New Ulm (8192) in NEW ULM, MN |