Home > United Community Bank > History
United Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for United Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1965-07-12 | Institution established: Original name:Chatham Community Bank | |
1987-01-14 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1988-11-21 | Changed name to United Community Bank | |
1989-07-20 | Acquired United Community Bank *Pawnee* (16104) in PAWNEE, IL | |
1994-04-11 | Acquired United Community Bank Bunker Hill (3771) in BUNKER HILL, IL | |
1994-04-11 | Acquired United Community Bank - Greenfield (12404) in GREENFIELD, IL | |
1994-04-11 | Acquired United Community Bank (1796) in GILLESPIE, IL | |
2005-08-19 | Acquired State Bank of Auburn (15859) in AUBURN, IL | |
2016-11-11 | Acquired Marine Bank and Trust (11685) in CARTHAGE, IL | |
2016-11-11 | Acquired Brown County State Bank (11721) in MOUNT STERLING, IL | |
2017-06-23 | Acquired Farmers State Bank of Camp Point (12091) in CAMP POINT, IL | |
2017-06-23 | Acquired Illini Bank (19980) in SPRINGFIELD, IL | |
2018-03-10 | Acquired Liberty Bank (33873) in ALTON, IL | |
2019-04-06 | Acquired Mercantile Bank (11301) in QUINCY, IL | |
2021-01-26 | Change trust powers from Limited to Full. |