Home > United Bank > History

United Bank, History

The following are major historical events for United Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1905-01-31Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Zebulon
1984-07-13Changed name to United Bank of Pike
1997-01-21Acquired United Bank of Griffin (29113) in GRIFFIN, GA
1997-01-21Acquired United Bank (20701) in BARNESVILLE, GA
1997-01-21Changed name to United Bank
2008-12-05Acquired First Georgia Community Bank (34301) in JACKSON, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21Acquired First Coweta Bank (57702) in NEWNAN, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-10-22Acquired The First National Bank of Barnesville (2119) in BARNESVILLE, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2014-07-31Acquired Monroe County Bank (156) in FORSYTH, GA
2016-08-19Acquired The Woodbury Banking Company (11297) in WOODBURY, GA as part of a government assisted transaction.