Home > Unified Bank > History
Unified Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Unified Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Citizens Savings Bank | |
1999-04-21 | Acquired The Citizens-State Bank of Strasburg (10265) in STRASBURG, OH | |
2007-07-01 | Acquired The Glouster Community Bank (16317) in LANCASTER, OH | |
2017-10-10 | Changed name to Unified Bank | |
2018-10-15 | Acquired The First National Bank of Powhatan Point (13567) in POWHATAN POINT, OH |