Home > Umpqua Bank > History
Umpqua Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Umpqua Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1953-11-09 | Institution established: Original name:South Umpqua State Bank | |
1972-04-17 | Moved bank headquarters from CANYONVILLE, OR to ROSEBURG, OR | |
1998-05-19 | Changed name to South Umpqua Bank | |
2000-12-04 | Acquired Valley of the Rogue Bank (19823) in ROGUE RIVER, OR | |
2000-12-04 | Changed name to Umpqua Bank | |
2001-12-27 | Acquired Linn-Benton Bank (32761) in ALBANY, OR | |
2001-12-31 | Acquired Lincoln Security Bank (34179) in NEWPORT, OR | |
2001-12-31 | Acquired Oregon State Bank (34972) in CORVALLIS, OR | |
2001-12-31 | Acquired Security Bank (6016) in COOS BAY, OR | |
2001-12-31 | Acquired Pacific State Bank (18777) in REEDSPORT, OR | |
2001-12-31 | Acquired McKenzie State Bank (34740) in SPRINGFIELD, OR | |
2001-12-31 | Acquired Family Security Bank (34706) in BROOKINGS, OR | |
2002-11-15 | Acquired Centennial Bank (22493) in EUGENE, OR | |
2004-07-10 | Acquired Humboldt Bank (27582) in EUREKA, CA | |
2006-06-03 | Acquired Central California Bank (57372) in SONORA, CA | |
2006-06-03 | Acquired Western Sierra National Bank (24903) in CAMERON PARK, CA | |
2006-06-03 | Acquired Auburn Community Bank (34557) in AUBURN, CA | |
2006-06-03 | Acquired Lake Community Bank (25748) in LAKEPORT, CA | |
2007-04-27 | Acquired Vintage Bank (25853) in NAPA, CA | |
2009-01-16 | Acquired Bank of Clark County (34959) in VANCOUVER, WA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-01-22 | Acquired Evergreen Bank (20501) in SEATTLE, WA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-02-26 | Acquired Rainier Pacific Bank (38129) in TACOMA, WA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-06-18 | Acquired Nevada Security Bank (57110) in RENO, NV as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2012-11-14 | Acquired Circle Bank (32743) in NOVATO, CA | |
2014-04-18 | Acquired Sterling Savings Bank (32158) in SPOKANE, WA |