Home > U.S. Bank > History

U.S. Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for U.S. Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1863-07-13Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Cincinnati
1988-07-01Changed name to Star Bank, National Association, Cincinnati
1991-06-14Changed name to Star Bank, National Association
1991-08-30Acquired Star Bank, National Association, Butler County (23730) in HAMILTON, OH
1991-08-30Acquired Star Bank, National Association (6668) in FAIRBORN, OH
1992-06-19Acquired Star Bank, National Association, Cleveland (27360) in INDEPENDENCE, OH
1993-07-24Acquired Star Bank, National Association, Tri State (22343) in IRONTON, OH
1993-07-24Acquired Star Bank, National Association, Hillsboro (24375) in HILLSBORO, OH
1993-08-21Acquired Star Bank, Central Ohio (16964) in WESTERVILLE, OH
1993-09-18Acquired Star Bank, Preble County (6580) in EATON, OH
1993-09-18Acquired Star Bank, National Association, Troy (6719) in TROY, OH
1993-10-16Acquired Star Bank, National Association, Sidney (6698) in SIDNEY, OH
1994-09-16Acquired Transohio Federal Savings Bank (33629) in CLEVELAND, OH as part of a government assisted transaction.
1996-06-14Acquired Star Bank, National Association, Indiana (4374) in RICHMOND, IN
1996-06-14Acquired Star Bank, National Association, Kentucky (2687) in COVINGTON, KY
1998-08-21Acquired Trans Financial Bank Tennessee, National Association (27263) in COOKEVILLE, TN
1998-08-21Acquired Trans Financial Bank, National Association (17127) in BOWLING GREEN, KY
1999-02-12Changed name to Firstar Bank, National Association
1999-05-27Acquired Firstar Bank Illinois (14280) in CHICAGO, IL
1999-05-27Acquired Firstar Bank Iowa, National Association (10895) in DES MOINES, IA
1999-08-14Acquired Firstar Bank of Minnesota, National Association (21076) in ST. PAUL, MN
1999-08-14Acquired Firstar Bank Florida, National Association (26927) in WEST PALM BEACH, FL
1999-09-10Acquired Firstar Bank Burlington, National Association (15553) in BURLINGTON, IA
1999-09-11Acquired Firstar Bank Wisconsin (6205) in MADISON, WI
1999-10-15Acquired Firstar Bank Wausau, National Association (5334) in WAUSAU, WI
1999-10-15Acquired Firstar Bank Milwaukee, National Association (5308) in MILWAUKEE, WI
1999-11-12Acquired Firstar Metropolitan Bank & Trust (24426) in PHOENIX, AZ
2000-03-07Acquired Mercantile Bank of Arkansas National Association (15086) in NORTH LITTLE ROCK, AR
2000-04-14Acquired Mercantile Bank of Illinois (10025) in SPRINGFIELD, IL
2000-04-14Acquired Firstar Bank Kentucky (5861) in PADUCAH, KY
2000-05-12Acquired Mercantile Bank MidWest (1549) in DES MOINES, IA
2000-08-11Acquired Mercantile Trust Company, National Association (33854) in ST. LOUIS, MO
2000-08-11Acquired Firstar Bank Missouri, National Association (4573) in SAINT LOUIS, MO
2001-07-13Acquired Firstar Bank, National Association (10927) in OVERLAND PARK, KS
2001-08-09Changed name to U.S. Bank National Association
2001-08-09Acquired U.S. Bank National Association OR (23922) in CANBY, OR
2001-08-09Acquired U.S. Bank National Association (5134) in MINNEAPOLIS, MN
2002-01-11Acquired U.S. Bank National Association MT (2162) in BILLINGS, MT
2002-01-11Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association (34094) in CHICAGO, IL
2002-01-11Acquired U. S. Bank Trust, National Association (35225) in ATLANTA, GA
2002-01-11Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association (34142) in PHOENIX, AZ
2002-01-11Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association (33804) in SEATTLE, WA
2002-01-11Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association (90319) in ST. PAUL, MN
2002-01-11Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association (33626) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
2005-05-02Acquired U. S. Bank Trust Interim National Association, Connecticut (33132) in HARTFORD, CT
2006-09-05Reorganized.
2006-09-12Acquired WestStar Bank (22572) in VAIL, CO
2007-02-06Acquired HeritageBank (34970) in GREAT FALLS, MT
2008-06-01Acquired Mellon 1st Business Bank, National Association (23406) in LOS ANGELES, CA
2008-11-21Acquired Downey Savings and Loan Association, F.A. (30968) in NEWPORT BEACH, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2008-11-21Acquired PFF Bank & Trust (28344) in POMONA, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-04-24Acquired First Bank of Idaho, FSB (34396) in KETCHUM, ID as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired San Diego National Bank (23594) in SAN DIEGO, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired Park National Bank (11677) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired North Houston Bank (18776) in HOUSTON, TX as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired Pacific National Bank (30006) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired Citizens National Bank (25222) in TEAGUE, TX as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired Madisonville State Bank (33782) in MADISONVILLE, TX as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired Community Bank of Lemont (35291) in LEMONT, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired Bank USA, National Association (32218) in PHOENIX, AZ as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30Acquired California National Bank (34659) in LOS ANGELES, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-01Reorganized.
2011-01-28Acquired First Community Bank (12261) in TAOS, NM as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-12-31Reorganized.
2012-01-27Acquired BankEast (19869) in KNOXVILLE, TN as part of a government assisted transaction.
2012-11-12Reorganized.
2013-05-13Acquired U.S. Bank National Association ND (34590) in FARGO, ND