Home > The Washington Trust Company, of Westerly > History
The Washington Trust Company, of Westerly, History
The following are major historical events for The Washington Trust Company, of Westerly, including mergers and acquisitions.
1800-01-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Washington Trust Company (90393) | |
1981-01-01 | Changed name to The Washington Trust Company of Westerly (90393) | |
1982-01-02 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1982-01-02 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1982-01-02 | FDIC certificate number changed from (90393) to | |
1999-08-25 | Acquired PierBank (27608) in NARRAGANSETT, RI | |
2002-04-16 | Acquired First Bank and Trust Company (20615) in PROVIDENCE, RI | |
2005-08-31 | Reorganized. | |
2014-09-18 | Changed name to The Washington Trust Company, of Westerly |