Home > The Union State Bank of Everest > History
The Union State Bank of Everest, History
The following are major historical events for The Union State Bank of Everest, including mergers and acquisitions.
1901-08-05 | Institution established: Original name:The Union State Bank of Everest | |
2004-03-04 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2004-03-04 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2009-09-01 | Acquired Bank of Gower (8262) in GOWER, MO | |
2011-09-01 | Acquired The Bank of McLouth (15363) in MC LOUTH, KS | |
2015-07-11 | Acquired The State Bank of Oskaloosa (16205) in OSKALOOSA, KS |