Home > The State Bank > History
The State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for The State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1898-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:State Savings Bank of Fenton | |
1988-07-01 | Changed name to The State Bank | |
1988-07-01 | Reorganized. | |
1990-02-13 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2016-12-31 | Acquired Community State Bank (15868) in SAINT CHARLES, MI | |
2021-12-01 | Acquired Farmers State Bank of MunithThe State Bank (15011) in MUNITH, MI. |