The Peoples Bank, Biloxi, Mississippi, History

The following are major historical events for The Peoples Bank, Biloxi, Mississippi, including mergers and acquisitions.

1896-04-13Institution established: Original name:The Peoples Bank of Biloxi
1985-10-01Reorganized.
1988-08-19Acquired Gulf National Bank (16165) in GULFPORT, MS
1990-09-21Changed name to The Peoples Bank, Biloxi, Mississippi
1991-08-16Acquired Southern Federal Savings Bank (33088) in GULFPORT, MS