Home > The Ohio Valley Bank Company > History
The Ohio Valley Bank Company, History
The following are major historical events for The Ohio Valley Bank Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1872-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Ohio Valley Bank Company | |
1980-11-20 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1992-10-23 | Reorganized. | |
2000-11-10 | Acquired Jackson Savings Bank (30288) in JACKSON, OH | |
2013-05-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2013-05-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2016-08-06 | Acquired The Milton Banking Company (11085) in WELLSTON, OH |