Home > The Missouri Bank > History
The Missouri Bank, History
The following are major historical events for The Missouri Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Warren County Bank | |
1939-02-04 | Changed name to Commerce - Warren County Bank | |
1943-11-16 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1943-11-16 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1998-06-01 | Changed name to The Missouri Bank | |
2011-02-19 | Acquired Bay-Hermann-Berger Bank (18127) in HERMANN, MO | |
2020-04-04 | Acquired The Missouri Bank II (13787) in SEDALIA, MO |