The Huntington National Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for The Huntington National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1866-01-06Institution established: Original name:The Huntington National Bank of Columbus
1976-05-01Acquired The Pickerington Bank (5987) in PICKERINGTON, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington Portage National Bank of Kent (6613) in KENT, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington First National Bank of Kenton (6614) in KENTON, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington First National Bank of Lima (6624) in LIMA, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington National Bank of London (6626) in LONDON, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington Lagonda National Bank of Springfield (14257) in SPRINGFIELD, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington Bank of Toledo (15542) in TOLEDO, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington First National Bank of Medina County (6720) in WADSWORTH, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington Bank of Woodville (14896) in WOODVILLE, OH
1979-12-31Changed name to The Huntington National Bank
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington National Bank of Franklin (6586) in FRANKLIN, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington Bank of Washington Court House (9451) in WASHINGTON COURT HOUSE, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington Bank of Chillicothe (10269) in CHILLICOTHE, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington National Bank of Bellefontaine (6527) in BELLEFONTAINE, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington Bank of Wood County (12965) in BOWLING GREEN, OH
1979-12-31Acquired The Huntington Bank of Ashland (12577) in ASHLAND, OH
1980-03-31Acquired The Farmers and Merchants Bank (2069) in MILFORD CENTER, OH
1980-12-06Acquired The First National Bank of Burton (6535) in BURTON, OH
1982-03-18Acquired The Reeves Banking and Trust Company (10288) in DOVER, OH
1984-10-31Acquired The Huntington National Bank of Port Clinton (13851) in PORT CLINTON, OH
1984-10-31Acquired The Huntington National Bank of Northeast Ohio (15592) in CLEVELAND, OH
1989-05-01Acquired The Citizens State Bank (15045) in SILVERTON, OH
1993-05-07Acquired Charter Oak Federal Savings Bank (32309) in CINCINNATI, OH
1995-10-27Acquired The Huntington National Bank of Kentucky (9680) in CINCINNATI, OH
1997-06-30Acquired Huntington Banks of Michigan (23791) in TROY, MI
1997-06-30Acquired Huntington National Bank West Virginia (14289) in CHARLESTON, WV
1997-06-30Acquired The Huntington National Bank of Florida (26830) in MAITLAND, FL
1997-06-30Acquired The Huntington National Bank of Indiana (16842) in NOBLESVILLE, IN
1997-06-30Acquired The Huntington Trust Company, National Association (27189) in COLUMBUS, OH
1997-06-30Acquired The Huntington Trust Company of Florida, National Association (27279) in NAPLES, FL
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Lumberman's Bank (5037) in MUSKEGON, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-First Michigan Bank (10558) in ZEELAND, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Community Bank (18343) in DOWAGIAC, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Reed City Bank (14001) in REED CITY, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Northwestern Bank (11399) in BOYNE CITY, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-First Michigan Bank (22128) in GRAND RAPIDS, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Security Bank (17914) in MANISTEE, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Sault Bank (1096) in SAULT STE. MARIE, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Oceana Bank (10948) in HART, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Old State Bank (990) in FREMONT, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Commercial Bank (994) in GREENVILLE, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Maynard Allen Bank (14747) in PORTLAND, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Trust (33315) in HOLLAND TOWNSHIP, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-State Savings Bank (14696) in LOWELL, MI
1997-09-30Acquired FMB-Arcadia Bank (26987) in KALAMAZOO, MI
1997-10-31Acquired The Bank of Winter Park (27505) in WINTER PARK, FL
1999-01-29Acquired The Huntington State Bank (10278) in ALEXANDRIA, OH
1999-06-30Reorganized.
2000-06-23Acquired The Empire National Bank of Traverse City (12909) in TRAVERSE CITY, MI
2006-03-01Acquired Unizan Financial Services Group, National Association (34213) in CANTON, OH
2006-03-01Acquired Unizan Bank, National Association (14953) in CANTON, OH
2007-08-31Acquired Sky Trust, National Association (35403) in PEPPER PIKE, OH
2007-09-21Acquired Sky Bank (5982) in SALINEVILLE, OH
2009-10-02Acquired Warren Bank (34824) in WARREN, MI as part of a government assisted transaction.
2012-03-30Acquired Fidelity Bank (33883) in DEARBORN, MI as part of a government assisted transaction.
2014-03-01Acquired Advantage Bank (29864) in CAMBRIDGE, OH
2016-08-16Acquired Firstmerit Bank, National Association (13675) in AKRON, OH