Home > The First Security Bank > History
The First Security Bank, History
The following are major historical events for The First Security Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1897-04-03 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: The Farmers State Bank | |
1904-04-22 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1904-04-22 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
1904-04-22 | Changed name to The First National Bank of Overbrook | |
1904-04-22 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
1978-10-02 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1978-10-02 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1978-10-02 | Changed name to The First Security Bank | |
2007-11-14 | Reorganized. | |
2007-12-12 | Reorganized. | |
2012-07-14 | Acquired State Bank of Carbondale (21174) in CARBONDALE, KS |