The First National Bank of McConnelsville, History

The following are major historical events for The First National Bank of McConnelsville, including mergers and acquisitions.

1863-07-01Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of McConnelsville
2000-07-31Acquired The Junction City Banking Company (5964) in JUNCTION CITY, OH
2002-06-26Moved bank headquarters from MCCONNELSVILLE, OH to MC CONNELSVILLE, OH
2008-10-03Acquired The First National Bank of Nelsonville (398) in NELSONVILLE, OH
2011-01-20Moved bank headquarters from MC CONNELSVILLE, OH to MCCONNELSVILLE, OH