Home > The First National Bank of Hughes Springs > History
The First National Bank of Hughes Springs, History
The following are major historical events for The First National Bank of Hughes Springs, including mergers and acquisitions.
1903-06-03 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Hughes Springs | |
1990-03-15 | Acquired Liberty City State Bank (23065) in LIBERTY CITY, TX | |
1990-12-14 | Acquired The State Bank of Omaha, Texas (9019) in OMAHA, TX | |
1994-01-03 | Acquired The First National Bank of Atlanta (3081) in ATLANTA, TX | |
1999-08-09 | Acquired The First National Bank of Jefferson (16932) in JEFFERSON, TX | |
2014-03-01 | Acquired Citizens State Bank (18148) in TENAHA, TX | |
2016-09-09 | Acquired Bloomburg State Bank (13563) in BLOOMBURG, TX |