Home > The First National Bank of East Texas > History
The First National Bank of East Texas, History
The following are major historical events for The First National Bank of East Texas, including mergers and acquisitions.
1900-04-13 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Gilmer | |
1987-10-06 | Reorganized. | |
2010-06-01 | Reorganized. | |
2012-01-01 | Acquired Wood County National Bank (23739) in QUITMAN, TX | |
2014-01-01 | Acquired Security State Bank, National Association (17027) in ORE CITY, TX | |
2020-07-01 | Changed name to The First National Bank of East Texas | |
2021-05-19 | Moved bank headquarters from 206 U. S. Highway 271 North, Gilmer, TX to 206 U. S. Highway 271 North, Gilmer, TX. |