The First Bank and Trust Company, History

The following are a list of major historical events for The First Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.

1979-08-03Institution established: Original name:First Russell County Bank and Trust Company
1984-05-15Changed name to The First Bank and Trust Company
1993-09-22Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2000-11-03Moved bank headquarters from LEBANON, VA to ABINGDON, VA
2001-12-28Acquired First Bank and Trust Company of Tennessee (34099) in JOHNSON CITY, TN
2002-06-24Moved bank headquarters from ABINGDON, VA to LEBANON, VA
2003-05-01Acquired First Commonwealth Bank (24682) in WISE, VA