The Farmers National Bank of Canfield, History

The following are major historical events for The Farmers National Bank of Canfield, including mergers and acquisitions.

1887-02-17Institution established: Original name:The Farmers' National Bank of Canfield
1983-03-31Changed name to The Farmers National Bank of Canfield
2000-12-31Acquired The Security Dollar Bank (15220) in NILES, OH
2015-06-19Acquired First National Bank (6667) in ORRVILLE, OH
2015-10-01Acquired 1st National Community Bank (26977) in EAST LIVERPOOL, OH
2017-08-16Acquired The Monitor Bank (16921) in BIG PRAIRIE, OH
2020-01-07Acquired Geauga Savings Bank (32287) in NEWBURY, OH