The Equitable Bank, S.S.B., History

The following are major historical events for The Equitable Bank, S.S.B., including mergers and acquisitions.

1927-01-01Institution established: Original name:Equitable Savings and Loan Association
1982-10-31Acquired Heritage Savings and Loan Association (30068) in HALES CORNERS, WI
1989-05-31Changed name to The Equitable Bank, SSB
1991-10-01Acquired Horizon Savings Bank, S.A. (29195) in WEST ALLIS, WI
1993-07-01Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK
1993-07-01Changed name to The Equitable Bank, S.S.B.
1993-11-01Moved bank headquarters from HALES CORNERS, WI to WAUWATOSA, WI
2019-04-30Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
2019-04-30Reorganized.