Home > The City National Bank of Sulphur Springs > History
The City National Bank of Sulphur Springs, History
The following are major historical events for The City National Bank of Sulphur Springs, including mergers and acquisitions.
1889-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The City National Bank of Sulphur Springs | |
1998-12-31 | Acquired First National Bank of Sulphur Springs (23068) in SULPHUR SPRINGS, TX | |
2004-02-27 | Acquired The First State Bank (16785) in HAWKINS, TX | |
2011-03-12 | Acquired The First National Bank of Mineola (3347) in MINEOLA, TX | |
2016-10-01 | Acquired Citizens National Bank of Wills Point (23450) in WILLS POINT, TX | |
2021-01-29 | Acquired The Morris County National Bank of NaplesThe City National Bank of Sulphur Springs (3358) in NAPLES, TX. |