The Citizens National Bank of Meridian, History

The following are a list of major historical events for The Citizens National Bank of Meridian, including mergers and acquisitions.

1888-01-01Institution established: Original name:The Citizens National Bank of Meridian
1973-03-08Acquired Bank of Macon (11449) in MACON, MS
1987-04-30Acquired The Stonewall Bank (9779) in QUITMAN, MS
1991-05-31Acquired Southeastern Federal Savings Bank (33034) in LAUREL, MS
2000-06-30Reorganized.