Home > The Citizens Bank > History
The Citizens Bank, History
The following are major historical events for The Citizens Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1938-09-24 | Institution established: Original name:The Citizens Bank | |
1988-12-12 | Reorganized. | |
2007-06-09 | Acquired Pamplico Bank and Trust Company (16301) in PAMPLICO, SC | |
2007-06-09 | Acquired Johnsonville State Bank (16420) in JOHNSONVILLE, SC | |
2018-11-30 | Acquired Heritage Community Bank (35076) in HARTSVILLE, SC | |
2022-07-01 | Acquired Sandhills BankThe Citizens Bank (17953) in NORTH MYRTLE BEACH, SC. |