Home > The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company > History
The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1981-07-01 | Institution established: Original name:Security Trust Company | |
1982-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from SAN FRANCISCO, CA to LOS ANGELES, CA | |
1984-12-21 | Changed name to Bradford Trust Company of California | |
1985-04-11 | Changed name to Fidata Trust Company California | |
1986-02-05 | Changed name to Wall Street Trust Company California | |
1988-04-15 | Changed name to The Bank of New York Trust Company of California | |
1989-12-15 | Acquired Irving Trust Company California (27025) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA | |
1995-08-30 | Changed name to BNY Western Trust Company | |
2004-11-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2004-11-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2004-11-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2004-11-01 | Changed organization type to TRUST COMPANY | |
2004-11-01 | Changed name to The Bank of New York Trust Company, National Association | |
2004-11-01 | Acquired The Bank of New York Trust Company, National Association (91271) in MIAMI, FL | |
2004-11-01 | Acquired BNY Missouri Interim Trust Company, National Association (34853) in ST. LOUIS, MO | |
2005-11-15 | Reorganized. | |
2008-07-01 | Changed name to The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association |