Home > The Bank and Trust, S.S.B. > History
The Bank and Trust, S.S.B., History
The following are major historical events for The Bank and Trust, S.S.B., including mergers and acquisitions.
1910-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Del Rio Bank & Trust Company | |
1956-02-27 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1956-02-27 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1998-01-01 | Acquired The First State Bank (11927) in BRACKETTVILLE, TX | |
1998-11-13 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
1998-11-13 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1998-11-13 | Changed name to The Bank and Trust, s.s.b. | |
1999-01-22 | Acquired The Bank and Trust, S.S.B. (24299) in SONORA, TX | |
2002-12-01 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2014-02-27 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2014-02-27 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD |