Texas Community Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Texas Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1983-06-20Institution established: Original name:Somerset National Bank
1988-05-06Reorganized.
2003-10-24Changed name to Texas Community Bank, National Association
2008-06-06Moved bank headquarters from SOMERSET, TX to LAREDO, TX
2013-12-21Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2013-12-21Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
2013-12-21Changed name to Texas Community Bank