Home > Texas Bank and Trust Company > History
Texas Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Texas Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1958-03-04 | Institution established: Original name:First State Bank of Longview | |
1962-02-12 | Changed name to Longview Bank and Trust Company | |
1988-07-15 | Acquired Oak Forest National Bank (25762) in LONGVIEW, TX | |
2003-09-22 | Changed name to Texas Bank and Trust Company | |
2011-10-28 | Acquired First State Bank (16768) in VAN, TX | |
2012-12-31 | Acquired The First National Bank of Canton (3130) in CANTON, TX | |
2013-12-07 | Acquired First State Bank (9014) in OVERTON, TX | |
2013-12-07 | Acquired Lindale State Bank (16278) in LINDALE, TX | |
2015-07-27 | Acquired Vision Bank - Texas (58447) in RICHARDSON, TX |