TD Bank, History
The following are major historical events for TD Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1852-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:PENOBSCOT SAVINGS BANK | |
1977-12-05 | Changed name to Penobscot Savings Bank | |
1982-07-01 | Changed name to Heritage Savings Bank | |
1982-07-01 | Acquired Waterville Savings Bank (17752) in WATERVILLE, ME | |
1982-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from BANGOR, ME to WATERVILLE, ME | |
1982-07-01 | Acquired Heritage Savings Bank (13064) in ROCKLAND, ME | |
1985-02-01 | Moved bank headquarters from WATERVILLE, ME to PORTLAND, ME | |
1985-02-01 | Changed name to Peoples Heritage Savings Bank | |
1985-02-01 | Acquired People's Savings Bank (17720) in PORTLAND, ME | |
1986-12-11 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1988-06-20 | Reorganized. | |
1993-03-31 | Acquired Oxford Bank and Trust (20839) in OXFORD, ME | |
1994-07-31 | Acquired Mid Maine Savings Bank F.S.B. (31926) in AUBURN, ME | |
1994-11-17 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1997-10-01 | Acquired Atlantic Bank National Association (25663) in PORTLAND, ME | |
2000-06-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2000-06-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2000-06-01 | Changed name to Peoples Heritage Bank, National Bank | |
2000-06-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2002-01-01 | Changed name to BankNorth, National Association | |
2002-01-01 | Acquired Evergreen Bank, National Association (7073) in GLENS FALLS, NY | |
2002-01-01 | Acquired First Massachusetts Bank, National Association (34136) in WORCESTER, MA | |
2002-01-01 | Acquired BANKNORTH INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT GROUP, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (34128) in BURLINGTON, VT | |
2002-01-01 | Acquired Franklin Lamoille Bank, National Association (14167) in SAINT ALBANS, VT | |
2002-01-01 | Acquired Bank of New Hampshire, National Association (6221) in FARMINGTON, NH | |
2002-01-01 | Acquired The Howard Bank, National Association (6267) in BURLINGTON, VT | |
2002-01-01 | Acquired First Vermont Bank , National Association (14147) in BRATTLEBORO, VT | |
2002-07-26 | Acquired Ipswich Savings Bank (90216) in IPSWICH, MA | |
2002-08-31 | Acquired Southington Savings Bank (18226) in SOUTHINGTON, CT | |
2002-12-31 | Acquired Warren Five Cents Savings Bank (24688) in PEABODY, MA | |
2003-02-14 | Acquired American Savings Bank (18246) in NEW BRITAIN, CT | |
2003-12-31 | Acquired First & Ocean National Bank (2623) in SEABROOK, NH | |
2004-04-30 | Acquired Cape Cod Bank and Trust, National Association (10538) in HYANNIS, MA | |
2004-04-30 | Acquired Foxborough Savings Bank (90198) in FOXBORO, MA | |
2005-01-21 | Acquired Boston Federal Savings Bank (28511) in BURLINGTON, MA | |
2005-05-23 | Changed name to TD BankNorth, National Association | |
2006-01-31 | Acquired Hudson United Bank (12256) in MAHWAH, NJ | |
2007-01-01 | Acquired Interchange Bank (20038) in SADDLE BROOK, NJ | |
2008-05-31 | Changed name to TD Bank, National Association | |
2008-05-31 | Moved bank headquarters from PORTLAND, ME to WILMINGTON, DE | |
2008-05-31 | Acquired Commerce Bank/North (22178) in RAMSEY, NJ | |
2008-05-31 | Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association (21140) in PHILADELPHIA, PA | |
2010-04-16 | Acquired Riverside National Bank of Florida (24067) in FORT PIERCE, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-04-16 | Acquired AmericanFirst Bank (57724) in CLERMONT, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-04-16 | Acquired First Federal Bank of North Florida (28886) in PALATKA, FL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2010-09-30 | Acquired Carolina First Bank (26849) in GREENVILLE, SC | |
2017-09-18 | Acquired Scottrade Bank (58656) in SAINT LOUIS, MO |