Home > TBK BANK, SSB > History
TBK BANK, SSB, History
The following are major historical events for TBK BANK, SSB, including mergers and acquisitions.
1981-07-15 | Institution established: Original name:Franklin National Bank | |
2004-07-23 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
2004-07-23 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2004-07-23 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2004-07-23 | Changed name to Equity Bank,SSB | |
2004-10-25 | Moved bank headquarters from MOUNT VERNON, TX to DALLAS, TX | |
2010-11-22 | Changed name to Triumph Savings Bank, SSB | |
2015-10-01 | Changed name to TBK BANK, SSB | |
2015-10-01 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2015-10-01 | Acquired (57918) | |
2016-08-01 | Acquired Colorado East Bank & Trust (3027) in LAMAR, CO | |
2017-12-09 | Acquired Valley Bank & Trust (25651) in BRIGHTON, CO | |
2018-09-08 | Acquired Citizens Bank of Pagosa Springs (33511) in PAGOSA SPRINGS, CO | |
2018-09-08 | Acquired The First National Bank of Durango (3014) in DURANGO, CO | |
2018-09-08 | Acquired Bank of New Mexico (16590) in GRANTS, NM |