Home > Sunwest Bank > History
Sunwest Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Sunwest Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1970-04-09 | Institution established: Original name:Santiago Bank | |
1972-12-04 | Changed name to Santiago Commercial Bank | |
1973-04-26 | Changed name to Santiago Bank | |
1980-11-24 | Changed name to Sunwest Bank | |
2009-06-26 | Acquired MetroPacific Bank (57893) in IRVINE, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2009-09-04 | Acquired First State Bank (34875) in FLAGSTAFF, AZ as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2009-11-13 | Acquired Pacific Coast National Bank (57914) in SAN CLEMENTE, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2012-12-21 | Moved bank headquarters from TUSTIN, CA to IRVINE, CA | |
2013-01-11 | Acquired Westside Community Bank (33997) in UNIVERSITY PLACE, WA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2014-01-30 | Acquired Syringa Bank (34296) in BOISE, ID as part of a government assisted transaction. |