Home > SULLIVAN BANK > History

SULLIVAN BANK, History

The following are a list of major historical events for SULLIVAN BANK, including mergers and acquisitions.

1895-04-01Institution established: Original name:Bank of Sullivan
1904-09-29Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED
1994-10-01Acquired Meramec State Bank (21931) in SULLIVAN, MO
1997-06-30Acquired American Federal Savings and Loan Association of Sullivan (31346) in SULLIVAN, MO
2012-12-14Acquired Community Bank of the Ozarks (27331) in SUNRISE BEACH, MO as part of a government assisted transaction.
2020-01-06Changed name to SULLIVAN BANK