Home > Stock Yards Bank & Trust Company > History
Stock Yards Bank & Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for Stock Yards Bank & Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1904-06-01 | Institution established: Original name:Stock Yards Bank & Trust Company | |
1972-07-14 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1988-10-03 | Reorganized. | |
1998-05-29 | Acquired Stock Yards Bank & Trust Company (21645) in AUSTIN, IN | |
2005-04-19 | Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2013-05-01 | Acquired THE BANK - Oldham County, Inc. (33829) in LAGRANGE, KY | |
2019-05-01 | Acquired King Southern Bank (18900) in CHAPLIN, KY | |
2021-06-30 | Acquired Kentucky BankStock Yards Bank & Trust Company (734) in PARIS, KY. | |
2022-03-07 | Acquired Commonwealth Bank and Trust CompanyStock Yards Bank & Trust Company (10146) in LOUISVILLE, KY. |