Home > State Bank of Texas > History
State Bank of Texas, History
The following are major historical events for State Bank of Texas, including mergers and acquisitions.
1987-10-19 | Institution established: Original name:State Bank of Texas | |
1990-03-29 | Acquired First National Bank of Garland (24014) in GARLAND, TX | |
1996-04-18 | Moved bank headquarters from DALLAS, TX to IRVING, TX | |
2009-07-02 | Acquired Millennium State Bank of Texas (57667) in DALLAS, TX as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2009-10-13 | Moved bank headquarters from IRVING, TX to DALLAS, TX | |
2014-10-24 | Acquired The National Republic Bank of Chicago (916) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2017-01-27 | Acquired Seaway Bank and Trust Company (19328) in CHICAGO, IL as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2017-05-01 | Reorganized. |