Home > Starion Bank > History
Starion Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Starion Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1993-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Southwest Bank - Bismarck | |
1995-10-10 | Acquired The First National Bank of Oakes (3955) in OAKES, ND | |
1995-10-10 | Changed name to First Southwest Bank | |
1995-10-10 | Acquired First Southwest Bank - Mandan (17988) in MANDAN, ND | |
1995-10-10 | Acquired The First National Bank and Trust Company of Ellendale (3920) in ELLENDALE, ND | |
2000-11-30 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2003-09-15 | Changed name to Starion Financial | |
2011-10-07 | Acquired Security State Bank (11518) in DUNSEITH, ND | |
2015-04-11 | Acquired WPS Community Bank, FSB (58829) in MADISON, WI | |
2016-09-28 | Changed name to Starion Bank |