Home > SSB Community Bank > History
SSB Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for SSB Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1924-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Strasburg Savings and Loan Company | |
1997-12-23 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1997-12-23 | Changed name to Strasburg Savings | |
1997-12-23 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2005-02-25 | Changed name to Strasburg Savings Bank | |
2014-03-07 | Changed name to SSB Community Bank | |
2018-01-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2018-01-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS |