Home > Spencer Savings Bank, SLA > History
Spencer Savings Bank, SLA, History
The following are major historical events for Spencer Savings Bank, SLA, including mergers and acquisitions.
1939-09-19 | Institution established: Original name:Spencer Savings and Loan Association | |
1988-02-29 | Changed name to Spencer Savings Bank, SLA | |
1988-03-31 | Acquired Elmora Savings and Loan Association (31260) in ELIZABETH, NJ | |
2002-11-11 | Moved bank headquarters from GARFIELD, NJ to ELMWOOD PARK, NJ | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2018-03-26 | Acquired Wawel Bank (32260) in GARFIELD, NJ | |
2021-11-17 | Moved bank headquarters from RIVER DRIVE CENTER 3 - 611 RIVER DRIVE, ELMWOOD PARK, NJ to 611 River Dr, Elmwood Park, NJ. | |
2021-11-17 | Acquired Mariner's BankSpencer Savings Bank, SLA (35479) in EDGEWATER, NJ. |